Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antioco Piseddu

Bishop Emeritus of Lanusei


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1936 BornSenorbi
29 Jun 196023.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 198145.0AppointedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
8 Nov 198145.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
31 Jan 201477.4RetiredBishop of Lanusei, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antioco Piseddu:
Bishop Antioco Piseddu (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lanusei

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lanusei.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 31 Jan 2014