Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastiano Francisco Pifferi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1848BornCastelmadama
14 May 187122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Oct 190556.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
2 Oct 190556.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierichus
22 Oct 190557.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierichus
30 Apr 190657.5AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
4 Feb 191263.3DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Francisco Pifferi:
Archbishop Sebastiano Francisco Pifferi O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1905, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013