Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Piasentini, C.S.Ch. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chioggia, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Cong. Sacer. Scuole di Carita)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1899Born
22 Jun 192424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Other
18 Feb 194646.5AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
19 Mar 194646.6Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
31 Jan 195252.5AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
1 May 197676.7RetiredBishop of Chioggia, Italy
31 Aug 198788.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Piasentini
Bishop Giovanni Battista Piasentini C.S.Ch. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018