Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Perényl

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

Titular Bishop of Tiberias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1761BornGalánta
14 Sep 178523.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Oct 178523.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 180846.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
11 Jul 180846.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
28 Aug 180846.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
15 Mar 181957.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Karol Perényl:
Bishop Karol Perényl (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013