Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karl Ambrose Ferdinand von Habsburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1785BornMilano, Italy
29 Aug 180620.8SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
17 Nov 180621.0ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
3 Nov 180722.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Vác, Hungary
4 Nov 180722.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
30 Jan 180822.2SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
16 Mar 180822.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
24 Jul 180822.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
2 Sep 180923.8DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Karl Ambrose Ferdinand von Habsburg:
Archbishop Karl Ambrose Ferdinand von Habsburg (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 1.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 353, and Page 386

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013