Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozef Ignác de Vilt (Wilt)

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1738³BornEsztergom
20 Sep 176022.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jul 176123.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 180062.1SelectedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
22 Dec 180062.5ConfirmedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
15 Feb 180162.6Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
17 Jun 180668.0SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
26 Aug 180668.1ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
5 Oct 181375.3DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jozef Ignác de Vilt (Wilt):
Bishop Jozef Ignác de Vilt (Wilt) (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 108, and Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013