Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Király

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1737³Born
31 May 176023.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Aug 176023.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 180770.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
18 Sep 180770.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
30 Oct 180770.5SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
22 Nov 180770.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
11 Jan 180870.7ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
17 Jul 182588.2DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József Király
Bishop József Király (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKomárom, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopCathedral, Győr, Diocese of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 18
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 316, and Page 364
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,704

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast