Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pál Rosos

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1751³BornSümeg
6 Mar 177322.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1774¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 180857.3SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
11 Jul 180857.5ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
28 Aug 180857.6Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
17 Jul 180958.5DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pál Rosos:
Bishop Pál Rosos (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 395

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013