Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Istvan Gosztonyi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

Titular Bishop of Tiberiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1739³BornAlsó-Lieszkó
18 Dec 181576.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
18 Dec 181576.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
21 Apr 181676.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
1817¹77.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Istvan Gosztonyi:
Bishop Istvan Gosztonyi (born , died 1817) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 11
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015