Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Kurbély

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1755³BornTuzsina
5 Oct 177722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 177823.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 180954.0SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
26 Sep 181459.1ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
5 Mar 181559.6Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
27 May 182165.8DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Kurbély:
Bishop György Kurbély (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,369
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 395

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013