Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Hugues Pelletier] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Maine-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1729Born
6 Feb 179162.0SelectedBishop of [Maine-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
13 Mar 179162.1Ordained BishopBishop of [Maine-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
30 Sep 179364.6ResignedBishop of [Maine-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
5 Apr 179566.1DiedBishop Emeritus of [Maine-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Hugues Pelletier (VIAF: 14880884)
Bishop Hugues Pelletier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Maine-et-Loire

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngers
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceAngers

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Oct 2018

Quantcast