Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maria Pérez Armendáriz

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1728BornPaucartambo
31 Mar 180678.0AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
11 Jun 180981.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
9 Feb 181990.9DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Maria Pérez Armendáriz:
Bishop José Maria Pérez Armendáriz (born , died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013