Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Livio Parladore (Parladore; Parlatore)

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1809BornOrsogna
1832²22.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Aug 184940.1SelectedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
28 Sep 184940.2ConfirmedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
18 Nov 184940.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
19 Sep 188879.2DiedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Livio Parladore (Parladore; Parlatore) (VIAF: 89315570)
Bishop Livio Parladore (Parladore; Parlatore) (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,844
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 365
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016