Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop François-Thérèse Panisset] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Mont-Blanc (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1729Born
1765²35.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 179363.7SelectedBishop of [Mont-Blanc (Constitutional), France]
7 Apr 179363.8Ordained BishopBishop of [Mont-Blanc (Constitutional), France]
26 Feb 179666.7ResignedBishop of [Mont-Blanc (Constitutional), France]
22 Feb 180979.7DiedBishop Emeritus of [Mont-Blanc (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Thérèse Panisset (VIAF: 22016720)
Bishop François-Thérèse Panisset (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mont-Blanc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambéry
Ordained BishopS. Nizier, Lyon
Death PlaceTresserve

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Oct 2018

Quantcast