Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Pala

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1928Born
29 Jul 195122.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cagliari, Italy
22 Feb 198455.3AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
6 May 198455.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
2 Jun 198455.6InstalledBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
21 May 198758.5DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Pala
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Pala (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarrubiu

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast