Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Sandro Overend Rigillo, O.F.M.

Apostolic Administrator of Benghazi, Libya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1959 Born
26 Sep 197617.6EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
2 Oct 197718.6Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 Sep 198223.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 198425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Dec 201960.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Benghazi, Libya

MicroData Summary for Sandro Overend Rigillo
Father Sandro Overend Rigillo O.F.M. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Benghazi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSliema, Archdiocese of Malta

Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Benghazi.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 8 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 10 Dec 2019

Quantcast