Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Ostaszewski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1746BornZiotow
29 Aug 176114.7ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
1770¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
4 Sep 181568.7AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
12 Nov 181568.9Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
17 Jan 181770.1DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Ostaszewski:
Bishop Tomasz Ostaszewski (born , died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,126
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013