Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas O’Doherty

Deceased

Bishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1877BornLissacull
22 Jun 190224.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 191941.6AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
14 Sep 191941.8Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
13 Jul 192345.6AppointedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
15 Dec 193659.0DiedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas O’Doherty:
Bishop Thomas O’Doherty (born , died ) Bishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015