Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Étienne Nogaret] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Lozère (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1726Born
23 Mar 179165.0SelectedBishop of [Lozère (Constitutional), France]
8 May 179165.1Ordained BishopBishop of [Lozère (Constitutional), France]
11 Jan 179467.8ResignedBishop of [Lozère (Constitutional), France]
30 Mar 180478.0DiedBishop Emeritus of [Lozère (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Étienne Nogaret
Bishop Étienne Nogaret (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lozère

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLes Salses
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceLa Canourgue

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 13 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Oct 2018

Quantcast