Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damián Nicolau Roig, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Huamachuco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1907Born
19 Apr 193022.4Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
23 Oct 196355.9AppointedPrelate of Huamachuco, Peru
8 Apr 196759.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bararus
25 Jul 196759.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bararus
25 Nov 197770.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Bararus
13 Sep 198173.8RetiredPrelate of Huamachuco, Peru
9 Aug 199890.7DiedPrelate Emeritus of Huamachuco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Damián Nicolau Roig
Bishop Damián Nicolau Roig T.O.R. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Huamachuco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca de Bonamy, Spain

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast