Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aimard-Claude de Nicolay

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Béziers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1738BornParis
4 Aug 177132.9SelectedBishop of Béziers, France
23 Sep 177133.1ConfirmedBishop of Béziers, France
13 Oct 177133.1Ordained BishopBishop of Béziers, France
2 Oct 180567.1ResignedBishop of Béziers, France
24 Jan 181576.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Béziers, France

MicroData Summary for Aimard-Claude de Nicolay
Bishop Aimard-Claude de Nicolay (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Béziers

  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016