Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Montefusco

Deceased

Bishop of Oria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1837BornNapoli
30 Mar 186124.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188346.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oria, Italy
15 Mar 188346.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
18 Mar 188346.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
1 Jun 188851.3AppointedBishop of Oria, Italy
21 Jun 189558.4DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Montefusco:
Bishop Tommaso Montefusco (born , died ) Bishop of Oria

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 228, and Page 576

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013