Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Montenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1633BornFribourg
16 May 165623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Switzerland
20 Dec 168855.8AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
15 May 168956.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
6 Jul 1707³74.3DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Montenbach:
Bishop Pierre de Montenbach (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015