Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Guillaume Molinier] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Hautes-Pyrénées (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1733Born
20 Mar 179158.1SelectedBishop of [Hautes-Pyrénées (Constitutional), France]
26 Apr 179158.2Ordained BishopBishop of [Hautes-Pyrénées (Constitutional), France]
1801²67.9ResignedBishop of [Hautes-Pyrénées (Constitutional), France]
31 Jan 181480.9DiedBishop Emeritus of [Hautes-Pyrénées (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Guillaume Molinier (VIAF: 59193420)
Bishop Jean-Guillaume Molinier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hautes-Pyrénées

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilhars
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 13 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Oct 2018

Quantcast