Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Julien Minée] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Loire-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1738Born
13 Mar 179152.4SelectedBishop of [Loire-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]
10 Apr 179152.5Ordained BishopBishop of [Loire-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]
16 Nov 179355.1ResignedBishop of [Loire-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]
16 Feb 180869.3DiedBishop Emeritus of [Loire-Inférieure (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Julien Minée (VIAF: 39486789)
Bishop Julien Minée (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Loire-Inférieure

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Oct 2018

Quantcast