Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Joseph Mestadier] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Deux-Sèvres (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1739Born
9 May 179152.2SelectedBishop of [Deux-Sèvres (Constitutional), France]
5 Jun 179152.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Deux-Sèvres (Constitutional), France]
May 1795³56.2ResignedBishop of [Deux-Sèvres (Constitutional), France]
3 Oct 180364.6DiedBishop Emeritus of [Deux-Sèvres (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Mestadier (VIAF: 316451061)
Bishop Jean-Joseph Mestadier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Deux-Sèvres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Foye-Monjault
Ordained BishopBordeaux
Death PlaceCoulon

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast