Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Santo Tomás y Mendoza, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1643Born
7 Jun 170764.4AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
19 Feb 170865.1Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
7 Aug 171370.5SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
11 Dec 171370.9ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
19 Aug 171774.6DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Santo Tomás y Mendoza
Bishop Manuel de Santo Tomás y Mendoza O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 26, Number 56
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 79, and Page 253
  • ob: CB, 10 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018