Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bonilla Vargas, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹BornMadrid
15 Dec 170456.9AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
Jan 1705³57.0Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
11 Apr 170759.2AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
1 Jan 171264.0DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bonilla Vargas:
Bishop Juan Bonilla Vargas O.SS.T. (born 1648, died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,455
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 25, Number 41
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 79, and Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015