Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph McMahon

Deceased

Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1875Born
20 May 190024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
2 Mar 192852.4AppointedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
26 Apr 192852.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
31 Dec 193257.2DiedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph McMahon
Bishop John Joseph McMahon (born , died ) Bishop of Trenton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHinsdale, NY

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018