Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samir Mazloum

Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)

Titular Bishop of Callinicum dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1934 BornKaakour
7 Jun 196429.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 199662.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
11 Nov 199662.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum dei Maroniti
11 Jan 199762.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum dei Maroniti
200065.3AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
6 Jun 201176.7RetiredCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Samir Mazloum:
Bishop Samir Mazloum (born ) Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,887
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2012, Page 855

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jul 2014