Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Aoun

Bishop of Jbeil {Byblos} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1959 BornDammour
9 Jun 198425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
5 Jun 201152.0SelectedBishop of Jbeil {Byblos} (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Jan 201252.6ConfirmedBishop of Jbeil {Byblos} (Maronite), Lebanon
25 Feb 201252.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jbeil {Byblos} (Maronite), Lebanon
26 Feb 201252.7InstalledBishop of Jbeil {Byblos} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Michel Aoun:
Bishop Michel Aoun (born ) Bishop of Jbeil {Byblos}

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Jbeil {Byblos} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Jan 2012
  • c34/i: CB, 25 Feb 2012
  • c4: CB, 27 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jul 2014