Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Guillaume Mauviel] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Saint-Domingue-Sud (Constitutional), Haïti]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1757Born
10 Nov 179740.0SelectedBishop of [Saint-Domingue-Sud (Constitutional), Haïti]
3 Aug 180042.7Ordained BishopBishop of [Saint-Domingue-Sud (Constitutional), Haïti]
1805¹47.1ResignedBishop of [Saint-Domingue-Sud (Constitutional), Haïti]
5 Mar 181456.3DiedBishop Emeritus of [Saint-Domingue-Sud (Constitutional), Haïti]

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Mauviel (VIAF: 69073982)
Bishop Guillaume Mauviel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Domingue-Sud

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFervaches, France
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceCézy

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast