Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Arbogast Martin] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Haut-Rhin (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1731Born
29 Mar 179159.9SelectedBishop of [Haut-Rhin (Constitutional), France]
10 Apr 179159.9Ordained BishopBishop of [Haut-Rhin (Constitutional), France]
11 Jun 179463.1DiedBishop of [Haut-Rhin (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Arbogast Martin (VIAF: 302329535)
Bishop Arbogast Martin (born , died ) Bishop of Haut-Rhin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWalbach
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceColmar

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Oct 2018

Quantcast