Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Vincent Marshall

Deceased

Bishop of Salford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1884Born
24 Jun 190823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
5 Aug 193955.0AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
21 Sep 193955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
14 Apr 195570.7DiedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Vincent Marshall
Bishop Henry Vincent Marshall (born , died ) Bishop of Salford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceListowel, County Kerry, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
Ordained PriestAll Hallows, College, Dublin, County Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Salford, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Death PlaceSt. Joseph, Hospital, Whalley Range, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Moston, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 48
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 149
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 May 2018

Quantcast