Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rogatien-Joseph Martin, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Verinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1849Born
15 Oct 187829.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
11 Apr 189041.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
3 Jun 189243.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
3 Jun 189243.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Jan 189343.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
27 May 191263.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Rogatien-Joseph Martin (VIAF: 93471006)
Bishop Rogatien-Joseph Martin SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeneston, Diocese of Nantes, France
Ordained BishopN.D. des Victoires, San Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California, USA

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 587
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017