Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Manurita

Deceased

Bishop of Ogliastra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1767BornTempio
1791¹23.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 183870.2SelectedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
13 Sep 183870.8ConfirmedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
20 Nov 183871.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
4 Dec 184477.0DiedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Manurita
Bishop Giorgio Manurita (born , died ) Bishop of Ogliastra

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 290
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Aug 2016