Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Malczyński

Deceased

Bishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1829Born
1860¹30.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 187040.4AppointedBishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
25 Jul 187040.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
21 Apr 190878.3DiedBishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Malczyński
Bishop Franciszek Malczyński (born , died ) Bishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHolubia, Diocese of Lublin, Poland
Ordained BishopCalmeti

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 88
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast