Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Maffeo

Deceased

Archbishop of Italy, Military

Titular Archbishop of Castellum in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1915BornOcchieppo Superiore
26 Jun 193822.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 196650.0AppointedArchbishop of Italy, Military
16 Jan 196650.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Castellum in Numidia
6 Mar 196650.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Castellum in Numidia
7 May 197155.3DiedArchbishop of Italy, Military

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maffeo:
Archbishop Luigi Maffeo (born , died ) Archbishop of Italy, Military

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015