Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Franz Lock

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

Titular Bishop of Antigonea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1751BornWittichenau
24 Jun 177624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
22 May 180149.6AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
22 May 180149.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Antigonea
1 Nov 180150.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antigonea
7 Sep 183179.9DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Franz Lock:
Bishop Georg Franz Lock (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013