Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignaz Bernhard Mauermann

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany

Titular Bishop of Pella

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1786Born
15 Aug 180822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
181528.9IncardinatedPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
31 Jan 181932.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany
14 May 181933.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
11 Jul 181933.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
183144.9AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
14 Sep 184155.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany

MicroData Summary for Ignaz Bernhard Mauermann
Bishop Ignaz Bernhard Mauermann (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuzelle
Ordained BishopDresde

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 40
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,161
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Apr 2020

Quantcast