Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Aloys (Algis) Schneider

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

Titular Bishop of Argos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1752BornBrno
30 Oct 176816.5ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
26 Sep 177523.5Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
29 Jan 180148.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany
1 Mar 181663.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
14 Jul 181664.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
22 Dec 181866.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Aloys (Algis) Schneider:
Bishop Johann Aloys (Algis) Schneider (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013