Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jacques-André-Simon Le Fessier] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Orne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1738Born
24 Feb 179152.9SelectedBishop of [Orne (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179153.0Ordained BishopBishop of [Orne (Constitutional), France]
1801²62.8ResignedBishop of [Orne (Constitutional), France]
2 Dec 180668.7DiedBishop Emeritus of [Orne (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques-André-Simon Le Fessier (VIAF: 24710035)
Bishop Jacques-André-Simon Le Fessier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArgentan
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceArgentan

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,791, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast