Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Luc-François Lalande], C.O. †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Meurthe (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1732Born
11 May 179159.3SelectedBishop of [Meurthe (Constitutional), France]
29 May 179159.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Meurthe (Constitutional), France]
7 Nov 179361.8ResignedBishop of [Meurthe (Constitutional), France]
27 Feb 180573.1DiedBishop Emeritus of [Meurthe (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Luc-François Lalande (VIAF: 27418883)
Bishop Luc-François Lalande C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meurthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Lô
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast