Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Joseph Koppes

Deceased

Bishop of Luxembourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1843Born
28 Aug 186824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Luxembourg
28 Sep 188340.0AppointedBishop of Luxembourg
4 Nov 188340.1Ordained BishopBishop of Luxembourg
30 Nov 191875.2DiedBishop of Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Johannes Joseph Koppes (VIAF: 107303621)
Bishop Johannes Joseph Koppes (born , died ) Bishop of Luxembourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanach, Diocese of Luxembourg
Ordained BishopS. Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1888
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1883, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017