Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tanios El Khoury

Bishop Emeritus of Saïda (Sidone) (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1930 BornSaghbine
14 Jun 195828.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saïda (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
8 Jun 199666.1AppointedBishop of Saïda (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
5 Oct 199666.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saïda (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
28 Dec 200575.6RetiredBishop of Saïda (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Tanios El Khoury:
Bishop Tanios El Khoury (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saïda (Sidone)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saïda (Sidone) (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 619
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,852

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013