Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Eid, O.M.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1943 BornMtolleh
28 Aug 197128.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ar-Rouhbanyat Al-Marounyat Liltoubawyat Mariam Al-Azra (Maronite)
1999¹55.4AppointedSuperior General of Ar-Rouhbanyat Al-Marounyat Liltoubawyat Mariam Al-Azra (Maronite)
24 Sep 200562.2SelectedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
28 Dec 200562.4ConfirmedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
11 Feb 200662.5Ordained BishopBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
16 Jun 201268.9ResignedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Eid:
Bishop François Eid O.M.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Caire {Cairo}

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,060
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jul 2014