Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Jung Shin-chul

Bishop of Incheon {Inch’on}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1964 BornIncheon-si, Songrim-dong
29 Jan 199328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)
29 Apr 201045.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)
29 Apr 201045.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cuicul
16 Jun 201045.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cuicul
10 Nov 201652.0AppointedBishop of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Jung Shin-chul (VIAF: 280535620)
Bishop John Baptist Jung Shin-chul (born ) Bishop of Incheon {Inch’on}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Incheon {Inch’on}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,658
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 Nov 2016