Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Francisco Irizar Salazar, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tumaco

Titular Bishop of Philae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1909BornOrmáiztegui, Spain
12 Feb 193323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
23 Apr 195445.1AppointedPrefect of Tumaco, Colombia
7 Feb 196151.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Philae
7 Feb 196151.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tumaco, Colombia
9 Apr 196152.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philae
5 Nov 196556.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Tumaco, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Francisco Irizar Salazar:
Bishop Luis Francisco Irizar Salazar O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tumaco

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1964
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013