Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Christian Franz de Paula zu Hohenlohe-Waldenburg-Bartenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1740BornBartenstein
19 Mar 177534.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Nov 178747.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
17 May 178847.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 178948.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
3 Aug 178948.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lerus
27 Sep 178948.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lerus
5 Jan 179554.1SucceededBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
27 Aug 179554.8InstalledBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 Jan 181776.2DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Christian Franz de Paula zu Hohenlohe-Waldenburg-Bartenstein
Bishop Joseph Christian Franz de Paula zu Hohenlohe-Waldenburg-Bartenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1789, Number 32
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 260, and Page 445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016