Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Hernández Milanés

Deceased

Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1755Born
20 Jul 180146.3AppointedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
11 Jul 180247.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
26 Mar 181257.0DiedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Santiago Hernández Milanés
Bishop Santiago Hernández Milanés (born , died ) Bishop of Mérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMieza, Spain

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 186
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 121, Number 643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018